House | 08/12/2024 | Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading | ||
House | 08/12/2024 | For message, see H4993 | ||
08/08/2024 | Governor returned to the House with amendment | |||
Senate | 08/01/2024 | Laid before the Governor | ||
Senate | 08/01/2024 | Enacted -see Roll Call #247 (Yeas 39 to Nays 0) | ||
House | 08/01/2024 | Enacted - 152 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 195 ) | ||
Senate | 07/31/2024 | Read third, Bills in the Third Reading discharged and passed to be engrossed | ||
Senate | 07/31/2024 | Taken out of the Orders of the Day | ||
Senate | 07/31/2024 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session | ||
Senate | 07/31/2024 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | ||
Senate | 07/31/2024 | Rules suspended | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules | ||
House | 03/04/2024 | Read third and passed to be engrossed | ||
House | 12/14/2023 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting | ||
House | 11/15/2023 | Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling | ||
Joint | 06/12/2023 | Hearing scheduled for 06/20/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Senate concurred | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |