05/04/2023 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 8 of the Acts of 2023 | |||
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Enacted and laid before the Governor | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Enacted | ||
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed | ||
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Taken out of the Orders of the Day | ||
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session | ||
House | 04/13/2023 | Read third and passed to be engrossed | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling | ||
Joint | 03/17/2023 | Hearing scheduled for 03/21/2023 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Senate concurred | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |