03/08/2024 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 42 of the Acts of 2024 | |||
Senate | 02/29/2024 | Enacted and laid before the Governor | ||
House | 02/26/2024 | Enacted | ||
Senate | 02/22/2024 | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed | ||
Senate | 02/22/2024 | Taken out of the Orders of the Day | ||
Senate | 01/18/2024 | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Read third and passed to be engrossed | ||
House | 12/21/2023 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | ||
House | 12/21/2023 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 12/21/2023 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting | ||
House | 11/22/2023 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling | ||
Joint | 04/11/2023 | Hearing scheduled for 04/18/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Senate concurred | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |