12/14/2023 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 78 of the Acts of 2023 | |||
Senate | 12/07/2023 | Enacted and laid before the Governor | ||
House | 12/04/2023 | Enacted | ||
Senate | 11/29/2023 | Taken out of the Orders of the Day | ||
Senate | 11/29/2023 | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed | ||
Senate | 10/05/2023 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | ||
Senate | 07/26/2023 | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session | ||
House | 07/17/2023 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 07/17/2023 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting | ||
House | 06/20/2023 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling | ||
Joint | 04/11/2023 | Hearing scheduled for 04/18/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Senate concurred | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |