Senate | 06/13/2024 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session | ||
House | 05/30/2024 | Read third and passed to be engrossed | ||
House | 05/06/2024 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 05/06/2024 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling | ||
Senate | 02/29/2024 | Senate concurred | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | Reporting date extended to Tuesday March 19, 2024, pending concurrence | ||
Joint | 11/29/2023 | Hearing scheduled for 12/05/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 | ||
House | 09/14/2023 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |