Senate | 03/14/2024 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | ||
Senate | 02/12/2024 | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Read third and passed to be engrossed | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting | ||
House | 12/28/2023 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling | ||
Joint | 11/07/2023 | Hearing scheduled for 11/14/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 | ||
Senate | 10/19/2023 | Senate concurred | ||
House | 10/16/2023 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |