05/30/2024 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 106 of the Acts of 2024 | |||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | Enacted and laid before the Governor | ||
House | 05/22/2024 | Enacted | ||
Senate | 05/21/2024 | Read third and passed to be engrossed | ||
Senate | 05/21/2024 | Taken out of the Orders of the Day | ||
Senate | 05/20/2024 | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading | ||
House | 05/16/2024 | Passed to be engrossed | ||
House | 05/16/2024 | Substituted for H4465 |