12/04/2024 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 249 of the Acts of 2024 | |||
Senate | 11/25/2024 | Enacted and laid before the Governor | ||
House | 11/21/2024 | Enacted | ||
House | 11/18/2024 | Read third and passed to be engrossed | ||
House | 10/17/2024 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | ||
House | 10/17/2024 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 10/17/2024 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting | ||
House | 09/26/2024 | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling | ||
Senate | 09/23/2024 | Passed to be engrossed | ||
Senate | 09/23/2024 | New draft (Finegold) for S2581 |