House | 05/16/2022 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 423 | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/09/2022 | Third Reading Passed (42-0) | ||
Senate | 04/09/2022 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/09/2022 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/09/2022 | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
Senate | 03/18/2022 | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2022 | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
House | 02/17/2022 | Third Reading Passed (130-0) | ||
House | 02/15/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 02/15/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {513021/1 Adopted | ||
House | 02/14/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 01/12/2022 | First Reading Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 01/10/2022 | Hearing 1/18 at 2:30 p.m. | ||
House | 10/08/2021 | Pre-filed |