Maryland 2022 Regular Session

Maryland House Bill HB167 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1- LAWRENCE J. HOGAN, JR., Governor Ch. 423
21
3-– 1 –
4-Chapter 423
5-(House Bill 167)
62
7-AN ACT concerning
3+EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW.
4+ [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law.
5+ Underlining indicates amendments to bill.
6+ Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by
7+amendment.
8+ *hb0167*
89
9-Commission to Establish a Maryland Women Veterans Memorial
10+HOUSE BILL 167
11+P1 2lr0707
12+ (PRE–FILED)
13+By: Delegate Bagnall Delegates Bagnall, Belcastro, Bhandari, Carr, Chisholm,
14+Cullison, Hill, Johnson, Kaiser, Kelly, Kerr, Kipke, Krebs, Landis, R. Lewis,
15+Morgan, Pena –Melnyk, Pendergrass, Reilly, Rosenberg, Saab,
16+Sample–Hughes, Szeliga, and K. Young
17+Requested: October 8, 2021
18+Introduced and read first time: January 12, 2022
19+Assigned to: Health and Government Operations
20+Committee Report: Favorable with amendments
21+House action: Adopted
22+Read second time: February 15, 2022
1023
11-FOR the purpose of establishing the Commission to Establish a Maryland Women Veterans
12-Memorial to study establishing a memorial dedicated to Maryland women veterans;
13-and generally relating to the Commission to Establish a Maryland Women Veterans
14-Memorial.
24+CHAPTER ______
1525
16-Preamble
26+AN ACT concerning 1
1727
18- WHEREAS, The women of Maryland have served as members of this nation’s armed
19-forces in every conflict in defense of the U.S.; and
28+Commission to Establish a Maryland Women Veterans Memorial 2
2029
21- WHEREAS, Women veterans of Maryland have served in every area of armed forces
22-assignment, including the bearing of arms; and
30+FOR the purpose of establishing the Commission to Establish a Maryland Women Veterans 3
31+Memorial to study establishing a memorial dedicated to Maryland women veterans; 4
32+and generally relating to the Commission to Establish a Maryland Women Veterans 5
33+Memorial. 6
2334
24- WHEREAS, The service provided by women veterans of Maryland is worthy of a
25-memorialization that properly honors those who willingly place themselves in danger on
26-behalf of those whom that service protects; and
35+Preamble 7
2736
28- WHEREAS, There is no significant memorial established within Maryland that
29-honors the service of the women veterans of Maryland; now, therefore,
37+ WHEREAS, The women of Maryland have served as members of this nation’s armed 8
38+forces in every conflict in defense of the U.S.; and 9
3039
31- SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND,
32-That:
40+ WHEREAS, Women veterans of Maryland have served in every area of armed forces 10
41+assignment, including the bearing of arms; and 11
3342
34- (a) There is a Commission to Establish a Maryland Women Veterans Memorial.
43+ WHEREAS, The service provided by women veterans of Maryland is worthy of a 12
44+memorialization that properly honors those who willingly place themselves in danger on 13
45+behalf of those whom that service protects; and 14
3546
36- (b) The Commission consists of the following members:
47+ WHEREAS, There is no significant memorial established within Maryland that 15
48+honors the service of the women veterans of Maryland; now, therefore, 16 2 HOUSE BILL 167
3749
38- (1) one member of the Senate of Maryland who serves on the Maryland
39-General Assembly’s Veteran’s Caucus, appointed by the President of the Senate;
4050
41- (2) one member of the House of Delegates who serves on the Maryland
42-General Assembly’s Veteran’s Caucus, appointed by the Speaker of the House;
4351
44- (3) (1) the Secretary of Veteran’s Veterans Affairs, or the Secretary’s designee;
52+ SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 1
53+That: 2
4554
46- (4) (2) the Secretary of General Services, or the Secretary’s designee; and
55+ (a) There is a Commission to Establish a Maryland Women Veterans Memorial. 3
4756
48- (5) the following members, appointed by the Governor on or before
49-September 1, 2022: Ch. 423 2022 LAWS OF MARYLAND
57+ (b) The Commission consists of the following members: 4
5058
51-– 2 –
59+ (1) one member of the Senate of Maryland who serves on the Maryland 5
60+General Assembly’s Veteran’s Caucus, appointed by the President of the Senate; 6
5261
53- (i) (3) two representatives of the Maryland Veterans Commission,
54-designated by the Secretary of Veterans Affairs; and
62+ (2) one member of the House of Delegates who serves on the Maryland 7
63+General Assembly’s Veteran’s Caucus, appointed by the Speaker of the House; 8
5564
56- (ii) four representatives of women’s veterans organizations.
65+ (3) (1) the Secretary of Veteran’s Veterans Affairs, or the Secretary’s designee; 9
5766
58- (4) four representatives of veteran services organizations who are women,
59-designated by the Secretary of Veterans Affairs; and
67+ (4) (2) the Secretary of General Services, or the Secretary’s designee; and 10
6068
61- (5) one representative of the Maryland National Guard, designated by the
62-Adjutant General of Maryland.
69+ (5) the following members, appointed by the Governor on or before 11
70+September 1, 2022: 12
6371
64- (c) The members of the Commission shall elect a chair from among the
65-Commission’s members.
72+ (i) (3) two representatives of the Maryland Veterans Commission, 13
73+designated by the Secretary of Veterans Affairs; and 14
6674
67- (d) The Department of Veterans Affairs shall provide staff for the Commission.
75+ (ii) four representatives of women’s veterans organizations. 15
6876
69- (e) A member of the Commission:
77+ (4) four representatives of veteran services organizations who are women, 16
78+designated by the Secretary of Veterans Affairs; and 17
7079
71- (1) may not receive compensation; but
80+ (5) one representative of the Maryland National Guard, designated by the 18
81+Adjutant General of Maryland. 19
7282
73- (2) is entitled to reimbursement for expenses under the Standard State
74-Travel Regulations, as provided in the State budget.
83+ (c) The members of the Commission shall elect a chair from among the 20
84+Commission’s members. 21
7585
76- (f) The Commission shall provide recommendations for the funding, design,
77-construction, and placement of an appropriate memorial dedicated to Maryland women
78-veterans.
86+ (d) The Department of Veterans Affairs shall provide staff for the Commission. 22
7987
80- (g) On or before February 1, 2023, the Commission shall submit a preliminary
81-report on its findings and recommendations to the Governor and, in accordance with §
82-2–1257 of the State Government Article, the General Assembly.
88+ (e) A member of the Commission: 23
8389
84- (h) On or before September 30, 2023, the Commission shall submit a final report
85-on its findings and recommendations to the Governor and, in accordance with § 2–1257 of
86-the State Government Article, the General Assembly.
90+ (1) may not receive compensation; but 24
8791
88- SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect July
89-1, 2022. It shall remain effective for a period of 2 years and, at the end of June 30, 2024,
90-this Act, with no further action required by the General Assembly, shall be abrogated and
91-of no further force and effect.
92+ (2) is entitled to reimbursement for expenses under the Standard State 25
93+Travel Regulations, as provided in the State budget. 26
9294
93-Approved by the Governor, May 16, 2022.
95+ (f) The Commission shall provide recommendations for the funding, design, 27
96+construction, and placement of an appropriate memorial dedicated to Maryland women 28
97+veterans. 29 HOUSE BILL 167 3
98+
99+
100+
101+ (g) On or before February 1, 2023, the Commission shall submit a preliminary 1
102+report on its findings and recommendations to the Governor and, in accordance with § 2
103+2–1257 of the State Government Article, the General Assembly. 3
104+
105+ (h) On or before September 30, 2023, the Commission shall submit a final report 4
106+on its findings and recommendations to the Governor and, in accordance with § 2–1257 of 5
107+the State Government Article, the General Assembly. 6
108+
109+ SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect July 7
110+1, 2022. It shall remain effective for a period of 2 years and, at the end of June 30, 2024, 8
111+this Act, with no further action required by the General Assembly, shall be abrogated and 9
112+of no further force and effect. 10
113+
114+
115+
116+
117+Approved:
118+________________________________________________________________________________
119+ Governor.
120+________________________________________________________________________________
121+ Speaker of the House of Delegates.
122+________________________________________________________________________________
123+ President of the Senate.