Maryland 2022 Regular Session

Maryland House Bill HB167 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 05/19/2022

                             LAWRENCE J. HOGAN, JR., Governor Ch. 423 
 
– 1 – 
Chapter 423 
(House Bill 167) 
 
AN ACT concerning 
 
Commission to Establish a Maryland Women Veterans Memorial 
 
FOR the purpose of establishing the Commission to Establish a Maryland Women Veterans 
Memorial to study establishing a memorial dedicated to Maryland women veterans; 
and generally relating to the Commission to Establish a Maryland Women Veterans 
Memorial. 
 
Preamble 
 
 WHEREAS, The women of Maryland have served as members of this nation’s armed 
forces in every conflict in defense of the U.S.; and 
 
 WHEREAS, Women veterans of Maryland have served in every area of armed forces 
assignment, including the bearing of arms; and 
 
 WHEREAS, The service provided by women veterans of Maryland is worthy of a 
memorialization that properly honors those who willingly place themselves in danger on 
behalf of those whom that service protects; and 
 
 WHEREAS, There is no significant memorial established within Maryland that 
honors the service of the women veterans of Maryland; now, therefore, 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 
That: 
 
 (a) There is a Commission to Establish a Maryland Women Veterans Memorial. 
 
 (b) The Commission consists of the following members: 
 
 (1) one member of the Senate of Maryland who serves on the Maryland 
General Assembly’s Veteran’s Caucus, appointed by the President of the Senate; 
 
 (2) one member of the House of Delegates who serves on the Maryland 
General Assembly’s Veteran’s Caucus, appointed by the Speaker of the House; 
 
 (3) (1) the Secretary of Veteran’s Veterans Affairs, or the Secretary’s designee; 
 
 (4) (2) the Secretary of General Services, or the Secretary’s designee; and 
 
 (5) the following members, appointed by the Governor on or before 
September 1, 2022:  Ch. 423 	2022 LAWS OF MARYLAND  
 
– 2 – 
 
 (i) (3) two representatives of the Maryland Veterans Commission, 
designated by the Secretary of Veterans Affairs; and 
 
 (ii) four representatives of women’s veterans organizations. 
 
 (4)  four representatives of veteran services organizations who are women, 
designated by the Secretary of Veterans Affairs; and 
 
 (5) one representative of the Maryland National Guard, designated by the 
Adjutant General of Maryland.  
 
 (c) The members of the Commission shall elect a chair from among the 
Commission’s members. 
 
 (d) The Department of Veterans Affairs shall provide staff for the Commission. 
 
 (e) A member of the Commission: 
 
 (1) may not receive compensation; but 
 
 (2) is entitled to reimbursement for expenses under the Standard State 
Travel Regulations, as provided in the State budget.  
 
 (f) The Commission shall provide recommendations for the funding, design, 
construction, and placement of an appropriate memorial dedicated to Maryland women 
veterans. 
 
 (g) On or before February 1, 2023, the Commission shall submit a preliminary 
report on its findings and recommendations to the Governor and, in accordance with §  
2–1257 of the State Government Article, the General Assembly. 
 
 (h) On or before September 30, 2023, the Commission shall submit a final report 
on its findings and recommendations to the Governor and, in accordance with § 2–1257 of 
the State Government Article, the General Assembly. 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect July 
1, 2022. It shall remain effective for a period of 2 years and, at the end of June 30, 2024, 
this Act, with no further action required by the General Assembly, shall be abrogated and 
of no further force and effect.  
 
Approved by the Governor, May 16, 2022.