Senate | 05/16/2022 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 399 | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 03/31/2022 | Third Reading Passed (132-2) | ||
House | 03/30/2022 | Floor Amendment {123727/1 (Delegate Cox) Rejected (38-94) | ||
House | 03/30/2022 | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 03/30/2022 | Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/30/2022 | Favorable Adopted | ||
House | 03/18/2022 | Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m. | ||
House | 02/15/2022 | Referred Health and Government Operations | ||
Senate | 02/10/2022 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
Senate | 01/18/2022 | Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/18/2022 | Hearing canceled | ||
Senate | 01/16/2022 | Hearing 1/25 at 1:30 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/12/2022 | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
Senate | 08/24/2021 | Pre-filed |