Senate | 05/29/2022 | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 537 | ||
Senate | 04/09/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/08/2022 | Third Reading Passed (135-0) | ||
House | 04/08/2022 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 04/08/2022 | Favorable Report by Appropriations | ||
House | 03/23/2022 | Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | Referred Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/18/2022 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 03/16/2022 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/16/2022 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/16/2022 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 03/08/2022 | Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation) and Hearing canceled (Judicial Proceedings) | ||
Senate | 03/08/2022 | Hearing canceled (Budget and Taxation) and Hearing canceled (Judicial Proceedings) | ||
Senate | 02/22/2022 | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation) and Hearing canceled (Judicial Proceedings) | ||
Senate | 02/10/2022 | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation) and Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings) | ||
Senate | 02/09/2022 | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings) | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | First Reading Budget and Taxation and Judicial Proceedings |