House | 03/28/2022 | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations | ||
Senate | 03/25/2022 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 03/24/2022 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/24/2022 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/24/2022 | Favorable Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 03/14/2022 | Hearing 3/22 at 1:30 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2022 | Hearing canceled | ||
Senate | 03/10/2022 | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/03/2022 | Rereferred to Finance | ||
Senate | 02/28/2022 | Rereferred to Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 02/14/2022 | First Reading Senate Rules |