Maryland 2022 Regular Session

Maryland Senate Bill SB955 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11
22
33 EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW.
44 [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law.
5- Underlining indicates amendments to bill.
6- Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by
7-amendment.
85 *sb0955*
96
107 SENATE BILL 955
118 P4, F5 2lr3180
129 CF HB 374
1310 By: Senator Benson
1411 Introduced and read first time: February 14, 2022
1512 Assigned to: Rules
16-Re–referred to: Budget and Taxation, February 21, 2022
17-Re–referred to: Finance, February 23, 2022
18-Committee Report: Favorable
19-Senate action: Adopted
20-Read second time: March 13, 2022
2113
22-CHAPTER ______
14+A BILL ENTITLED
2315
2416 AN ACT concerning 1
2517
2618 Maryland School for the Deaf – Professional Personnel and Staff – Service 2
2719 Designation, Assignment, and Placement in a Collective Bargaining Unit 3
2820
2921 FOR the purpose of establishing that professional personnel and staff employed by the 4
3022 Maryland School for the Deaf are in the professional and skilled services of the State 5
3123 Personnel Management System; requiring that the Secretary of Budget and 6
3224 Management assign the professional personnel and staff to the professional and 7
3325 skilled services of the State Personnel Management System and to certain 8
3426 bargaining units; requiring that the professional personnel and staff suffer no 9
3527 diminution of pay or benefits; and generally relating to professional personnel and 10
3628 staff of the Maryland School for the Deaf. 11
3729
3830 BY adding to 12
3931 Article – Education 13
4032 Section 8–3A–04(l) 14
4133 Annotated Code of Maryland 15
4234 (2018 Replacement Volume and 2021 Supplement) 16
4335
4436 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 17
4537 That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 18
4638
4739 Article – Education 19
48- 2 SENATE BILL 955
40+
41+8–3A–04. 20
42+
43+ (L) PROFESSIONAL PERSONNE L AND STAFF EMPLOYED BY THE MARYLAND 21
44+SCHOOL FOR THE DEAF ARE IN THE PROFE SSIONAL AND SKILLED SERVICES IN THE 22
45+STATE PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT SYSTEM. 23
46+
47+ SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That, notwithstanding any other 24 2 SENATE BILL 955
4948
5049
51-8–3A–04. 1
50+provision of law, before December 31, 2022, the Secretary of Budget and Management shall 1
51+assign all professional personnel and staff classifications and positions of the Maryland 2
52+School for the Deaf to the professional and skilled services in the State Personnel 3
53+Management System, and the Secretary shall assign all positions in the professional and 4
54+skilled services, except for faculty at the Maryland School for the Deaf, to bargaining unit 5
55+A, B, C, D, F, or H. 6
5256
53- (L) PROFESSIONAL PERSONNE L AND STAFF EMPLOYED BY THE MARYLAND 2
54-SCHOOL FOR THE DEAF ARE IN THE PROFE SSIONAL AND SKILLED SERVICES IN THE 3
55-STATE PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT SYSTEM. 4
57+ SECTION 3. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That, notwithstanding any other 7
58+provision of law, an employee of the Maryland School for the Deaf: 8
5659
57- SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That, notwithstanding any other 5
58-provision of law, before December 31, 2022, the Secretary of Budget and Management shall 6
59-assign all professional personnel and staff classifications and positions of the Maryland 7
60-School for the Deaf to the professional and skilled services in the State Personnel 8
61-Management System, and the Secretary shall assign all positions in the professional and 9
62-skilled services, except for faculty at the Maryland School for the Deaf, to bargaining unit 10
63-A, B, C, D, F, or H. 11
60+ (1) migrated to the State Personnel Management System or assigned to a 9
61+bargaining unit by the Secretary of Budget and Management shall suffer no diminution of 10
62+pay or benefits resulting from the migration or assignment; and 11
6463
65- SECTION 3. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That, notwithstanding any other 12
66-provision of law, an employee of the Maryland School for the Deaf: 13
64+ (2) in the course of a migration for assignment, may be placed on a new 12
65+salary schedule only at a grade and step that results in a greater annual rate of pay. 13
6766
68- (1) migrated to the State Personnel Management System or assigned to a 14
69-bargaining unit by the Secretary of Budget and Management shall suffer no diminution of 15
70-pay or benefits resulting from the migration or assignment; and 16
67+ SECTION 4. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect July 14
68+1, 2022. 15
7169
72- (2) in the course of a migration for assignment, may be placed on a new 17
73-salary schedule only at a grade and step that results in a greater annual rate of pay. 18
74-
75- SECTION 4. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect July 19
76-1, 2022. 20
77-
78-
79-
80-
81-Approved:
82-________________________________________________________________________________
83- Governor.
84-________________________________________________________________________________
85- President of the Senate.
86-________________________________________________________________________________
87- Speaker of the House of Delegates.