Maryland 2022 2022 Regular Session

Maryland Senate Bill SB955 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 03/24/2022

                     
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
         Underlining indicates amendments to bill. 
         Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by 
amendment. 
          *sb0955*  
  
SENATE BILL 955 
P4, F5   	2lr3180 
    	CF HB 374 
By: Senator Benson 
Introduced and read first time: February 14, 2022 
Assigned to: Rules 
Re–referred to: Budget and Taxation, February 21, 2022 
Re–referred to: Finance, February 23, 2022 
Committee Report: Favorable 
Senate action: Adopted 
Read second time: March 13, 2022 
 
CHAPTER ______ 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Maryland School for the Deaf – Professional Personnel and Staff – Service 2 
Designation, Assignment, and Placement in a Collective Bargaining Unit 3 
 
FOR the purpose of establishing that professional personnel and staff employed by the 4 
Maryland School for the Deaf are in the professional and skilled services of the State 5 
Personnel Management System; requiring that the Secretary of Budget and 6 
Management assign the professional personnel and staff to the professional and 7 
skilled services of the State Personnel Management System and to certain 8 
bargaining units; requiring that the professional personnel and staff suffer no 9 
diminution of pay or benefits; and generally relating to professional personnel and 10 
staff of the Maryland School for the Deaf. 11 
 
BY adding to 12 
 Article – Education 13 
Section 8–3A–04(l) 14 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 15 
 (2018 Replacement Volume and 2021 Supplement) 16 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 17 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 18 
  
Article – Education 19 
  2 	SENATE BILL 955  
 
 
8–3A–04. 1 
 
 (L) PROFESSIONAL PERSONNE L AND STAFF EMPLOYED BY THE MARYLAND 2 
SCHOOL FOR THE DEAF ARE IN THE PROFE SSIONAL AND SKILLED SERVICES IN THE 3 
STATE PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT SYSTEM. 4 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That, notwithstanding any other 5 
provision of law, before December 31, 2022, the Secretary of Budget and Management shall 6 
assign all professional personnel and staff classifications and positions of the Maryland 7 
School for the Deaf to the professional and skilled services in the State Personnel 8 
Management System, and the Secretary shall assign all positions in the professional and 9 
skilled services, except for faculty at the Maryland School for the Deaf, to bargaining unit 10 
A, B, C, D, F, or H. 11 
 
 SECTION 3. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That, notwithstanding any other 12 
provision of law, an employee of the Maryland School for the Deaf: 13 
 
 (1) migrated to the State Personnel Management System or assigned to a 14 
bargaining unit by the Secretary of Budget and Management shall suffer no diminution of 15 
pay or benefits resulting from the migration or assignment; and 16 
 
 (2) in the course of a migration for assignment, may be placed on a new 17 
salary schedule only at a grade and step that results in a greater annual rate of pay. 18 
 
 SECTION 4. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect July 19 
1, 2022. 20 
 
 
 
 
Approved: 
________________________________________________________________________________  
 Governor. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
         President of the Senate. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
  Speaker of the House of Delegates.