House | 03/29/2022 | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations | ||
Senate | 03/28/2022 | Third Reading Passed (44-0) | ||
Senate | 03/25/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/25/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {633125/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/25/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 03/16/2022 | Hearing 3/22 at 1:30 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/09/2022 | Rereferred to Finance | ||
Senate | 02/22/2022 | First Reading Senate Rules |