House | 05/08/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 502 | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Passed Enrolled | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Third Reading Passed (139-0) | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | House Concurs Senate Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | Third Reading Passed (43-0) | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {413027/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Motion Special Order until 4/4 (Senator Smith) Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {413027/1 | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Referred Judicial Proceedings | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Third Reading Passed (137-0) | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 02/13/2023 | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/10/2023 | First Reading Environment and Transportation |