House | 04/07/2023 | Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Referred Environment and Transportation | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {293129/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 02/01/2023 | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/30/2023 | First Reading Finance |