House | 04/25/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 262 | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | Passed Enrolled | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | Third Reading Passed (136-0) | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | House Concurs Senate Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/06/2024 | Third Reading Passed (41-2) | ||
Senate | 04/06/2024 | Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator King) Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/06/2024 | Floor Amendment {723327/1 (Senator King) Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/06/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {563124/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/06/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 04/06/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Referred Judicial Proceedings Finance | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | Third Reading Passed (139-0) | ||
House | 03/16/2024 | Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted | ||
House | 03/16/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {403621/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/16/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | First Reading Judiciary |