House | 05/09/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 646 | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Passed Enrolled | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Third Reading Passed (132-1) | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | House Concurs Senate Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {323727/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/01/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Referred Finance | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | Third Reading Passed (138-1) | ||
House | 03/16/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {513822/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/16/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 02/09/2024 | Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | First Reading Environment and Transportation |