Senate | 03/19/2024 | Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | Third Reading Passed (138-1) | ||
House | 03/16/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/16/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {103327/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/16/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/10/2024 | First Reading Ways and Means | ||
House | 08/02/2023 | Pre-filed |