EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. Underlining indicates amendments to bill. Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by amendment. *hb0167* HOUSE BILL 167 F1 4lr0420 HB 15/20 – W&M (PRE–FILED) By: Delegate Harrison Requested: August 2, 2023 Introduced and read first time: January 10, 2024 Assigned to: Ways and Means Committee Report: Favorable with amendments House action: Adopted Read second time: March 8, 2024 CHAPTER ______ AN ACT concerning 1 Public Schools – Student Health – Certificate of Dental Health Information on 2 Accessible Dental Health 3 FOR the purpose of requiring, beginning in a certain school year, certain students to submit 4 a certificate of dental health to their school on a certain schedule; requiring the State 5 Department of Education, in consultation with the Maryland Department of Health, 6 to adopt certain regulations and to develop and disseminate a certain form to county 7 boards of education and certain parents and guardians; requiring the State 8 Department of Education to support and facilitate each county board of education in 9 publishing certain information on dental health in a certain manner; and generally 10 relating to public schools and a certificate of dental health. 11 BY adding to 12 Article – Education 13 Section 7–402.1 14 Annotated Code of Maryland 15 (2022 Replacement Volume and 2023 Supplement) 16 BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 17 Article – Education 18 Section 4–111.2 19 Annotated Code of Maryland 20 (2022 Replacement Volume and 2023 Supplement) 21 2 HOUSE BILL 167 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 1 That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 2 Article – Education 3 7–402.1. 4 (A) BEGINNING IN THE 2026–2027 SCHOOL YEAR , EACH STUDENT 5 ENROLLED IN A PUBLIC ELEMENTARY OR SECOND ARY SCHOOL IN THE STATE SHALL 6 SUBMIT TO THE SCHOOL A CERTIFICATE OF DENTAL HEALTH ON A S CHEDULE 7 ESTABLISHED BY THE DEPARTMENT . 8 (B) THE DEPARTMENT SHALL : 9 (1) IN CONSULTATION WITH THE MARYLAND DEPARTMENT OF 10 HEALTH, ADOPT REGULATIONS TO ESTABLISH: 11 (I) STANDARDS FOR PERIODI C DENTAL EXAMINATION S; AND 12 (II) A SCHEDULE FOR THE SUBMISSION OF A CERTIFICATE OF 13 DENTAL HEALTH BY STU DENTS; AND 14 (2) DEVELOP AND DISSEMINA TE A STANDARD FORM F OR A 15 CERTIFICATE OF DENTA L HEALTH AS REQUIRED UNDER SUBSECTION (A) OF THIS 16 SECTION TO THE COUNT Y BOARDS AND THE PAR ENTS AND GUARDIANS O F STUDENTS 17 IN PUBLIC ELEMENTARY AND SECONDARY SCHOOL S. 18 4–111.2. 19 The Department shall: 20 (1) Support and facilitate oral health education, including oral disease 21 prevention and dental health promotion, in every county; 22 (2) Develop a process to monitor implementation of oral health education; 23 [and] 24 (3) SUPPORT AND FACILITAT E EACH COUNTY BOARD IN PUBLISHING 25 INFORMATION ON FINAN CIALLY ACCESSIBLE DE NTAL HEALTH AVAILABL E IN THE 26 COUNTY IN STUDENT HA NDBOOKS AND ON LOCAL SCHOOL SYSTEM WEBSITES ; AND 27 [(3)] (4) On or before December 1, 2015, and every 5 years thereafter, 28 submit to the Governor and, subject to § 2–1257 of the State Government Article, the 29 General Assembly a summary of the information reported by the Department to the State 30 Superintendent during the certification of the Health Education State Curriculum. 31 HOUSE BILL 167 3 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect 1 October 1, 2024. 2 Approved: ________________________________________________________________________________ Governor. ________________________________________________________________________________ Speaker of the House of Delegates. ________________________________________________________________________________ President of the Senate.