Maryland 2024 Regular Session

Maryland House Bill HB167 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11
22
33 EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW.
44 [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law.
5- Underlining indicates amendments to bill.
6- Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by
7-amendment.
85 *hb0167*
96
107 HOUSE BILL 167
118 F1 4lr0420
129 HB 15/20 – W&M (PRE–FILED)
1310 By: Delegate Harrison
1411 Requested: August 2, 2023
1512 Introduced and read first time: January 10, 2024
1613 Assigned to: Ways and Means
17-Committee Report: Favorable with amendments
18-House action: Adopted
19-Read second time: March 8, 2024
2014
21-CHAPTER ______
15+A BILL ENTITLED
2216
2317 AN ACT concerning 1
2418
25-Public Schools – Student Health – Certificate of Dental Health Information on 2
26-Accessible Dental Health 3
19+Public Schools – Student Health – Certificate of Dental Health 2
2720
28-FOR the purpose of requiring, beginning in a certain school year, certain students to submit 4
29-a certificate of dental health to their school on a certain schedule; requiring the State 5
30-Department of Education, in consultation with the Maryland Department of Health, 6
31-to adopt certain regulations and to develop and disseminate a certain form to county 7
32-boards of education and certain parents and guardians; requiring the State 8
33-Department of Education to support and facilitate each county board of education in 9
34-publishing certain information on dental health in a certain manner; and generally 10
35-relating to public schools and a certificate of dental health. 11
21+FOR the purpose of requiring, beginning in a certain school year, certain students to submit 3
22+a certificate of dental health to their school on a certain schedule; requiring the State 4
23+Department of Education, in consultation with the Maryland Department of Health, 5
24+to adopt certain regulations and to develop and disseminate a certain form to county 6
25+boards of education and certain parents and guardians; and generally relating to 7
26+public schools and a certificate of dental health. 8
3627
37-BY adding to 12
38- Article – Education 13
39-Section 7–402.1 14
40- Annotated Code of Maryland 15
41- (2022 Replacement Volume and 2023 Supplement) 16
28+BY adding to 9
29+ Article – Education 10
30+Section 7–402.1 11
31+ Annotated Code of Maryland 12
32+ (2022 Replacement Volume and 2023 Supplement) 13
4233
43-BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 17
44- Article – Education 18
45-Section 4–111.2 19
46- Annotated Code of Maryland 20
47- (2022 Replacement Volume and 2023 Supplement) 21
34+ SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 14
35+That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 15
36+
37+Article – Education 16
38+
39+7–402.1. 17
40+
41+ (A) BEGINNING IN THE 2026–2027 SCHOOL YEAR , EACH STUDENT 18
42+ENROLLED IN A PUBLIC ELEMENTARY OR SECOND ARY SCHOOL IN THE STATE SHALL 19
43+SUBMIT TO THE SCHOOL A CERTIFICATE OF DEN TAL HEALTH ON A SCHE DULE 20
44+ESTABLISHED BY THE DEPARTMENT . 21
45+
46+ (B) THE DEPARTMENT SHALL : 22
4847 2 HOUSE BILL 167
4948
5049
51- SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 1
52-That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 2
50+ (1) IN CONSULTATION WITH THE MARYLAND DEPARTMENT OF 1
51+HEALTH, ADOPT REGULATIONS TO ESTABLISH: 2
5352
54-Article – Education 3
53+ (I) STANDARDS FOR PERIODI C DENTAL EXAMINATION S; AND 3
5554
56-7–402.1. 4
55+ (II) A SCHEDULE FOR THE SUB MISSION OF A CERTIFI CATE OF 4
56+DENTAL HEALTH BY STU DENTS; AND 5
5757
58- (A) BEGINNING IN THE 2026–2027 SCHOOL YEAR , EACH STUDENT 5
59-ENROLLED IN A PUBLIC ELEMENTARY OR SECOND ARY SCHOOL IN THE STATE SHALL 6
60-SUBMIT TO THE SCHOOL A CERTIFICATE OF DENTAL HEALTH ON A S CHEDULE 7
61-ESTABLISHED BY THE DEPARTMENT . 8
58+ (2) DEVELOP AND DIS SEMINATE A STANDARD FORM FOR A 6
59+CERTIFICATE OF DENTA L HEALTH AS REQUIRED UNDER SUBSECTION (A) OF THIS 7
60+SECTION TO THE COUNT Y BOARDS AND THE PAR ENTS AND GUARDIANS O F STUDENTS 8
61+IN PUBLIC ELEMENTARY AND SECONDARY SCHOOL S. 9
6262
63- (B) THE DEPARTMENT SHALL : 9
63+ SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect 10
64+October 1, 2024. 11
6465
65- (1) IN CONSULTATION WITH THE MARYLAND DEPARTMENT OF 10
66-HEALTH, ADOPT REGULATIONS TO ESTABLISH: 11
67-
68- (I) STANDARDS FOR PERIODI C DENTAL EXAMINATION S; AND 12
69-
70- (II) A SCHEDULE FOR THE SUBMISSION OF A CERTIFICATE OF 13
71-DENTAL HEALTH BY STU DENTS; AND 14
72-
73- (2) DEVELOP AND DISSEMINA TE A STANDARD FORM F OR A 15
74-CERTIFICATE OF DENTA L HEALTH AS REQUIRED UNDER SUBSECTION (A) OF THIS 16
75-SECTION TO THE COUNT Y BOARDS AND THE PAR ENTS AND GUARDIANS O F STUDENTS 17
76-IN PUBLIC ELEMENTARY AND SECONDARY SCHOOL S. 18
77-
78-4–111.2. 19
79-
80- The Department shall: 20
81-
82- (1) Support and facilitate oral health education, including oral disease 21
83-prevention and dental health promotion, in every county; 22
84-
85- (2) Develop a process to monitor implementation of oral health education; 23
86-[and] 24
87-
88- (3) SUPPORT AND FACILITAT E EACH COUNTY BOARD IN PUBLISHING 25
89-INFORMATION ON FINAN CIALLY ACCESSIBLE DE NTAL HEALTH AVAILABL E IN THE 26
90-COUNTY IN STUDENT HA NDBOOKS AND ON LOCAL SCHOOL SYSTEM WEBSITES ; AND 27
91-
92- [(3)] (4) On or before December 1, 2015, and every 5 years thereafter, 28
93-submit to the Governor and, subject to § 2–1257 of the State Government Article, the 29
94-General Assembly a summary of the information reported by the Department to the State 30
95-Superintendent during the certification of the Health Education State Curriculum. 31 HOUSE BILL 167 3
96-
97-
98-
99- SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect 1
100-October 1, 2024. 2
101-
102-
103-
104-Approved:
105-________________________________________________________________________________
106- Governor.
107-________________________________________________________________________________
108- Speaker of the House of Delegates.
109-________________________________________________________________________________
110- President of the Senate.