Senate | 04/25/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 304 | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Passed Enrolled | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Senate Concurs House Amendments | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | Third Reading Passed (138-0) | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {423721/1 Adopted | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/27/2024 | Hearing 3/27 at 1:30 p.m. | ||
House | 03/27/2024 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 03/16/2024 | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/15/2024 | Referred Ways and Means | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {623126/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment |