WES MOORE, Governor Ch. 304 – 1 – Chapter 304 (Senate Bill 654) AN ACT concerning Prince George’s County – Student Support – Specialist Networks and Success Action Plans Student Support and School Facilities and Public Safety Surcharges and Report – Sunset Extension (Student Supports and Success Act) FOR the purpose of establishing a Student Support Specialist Network consisting of certain school–based personnel at each public high school in Prince George’s County; requiring the Prince George’s County Board of Education to develop a certain template using certain guidelines; requiring each Student Support Specialist Network in the county to develop, approve, and implement a certain plan subject to review and approval by the Prince George’s County Board of Education; and generally relating to Student Support Specialist Networks and Student Support Success Action Plans in Prince George’s County extending the date by which Prince George’s County is required to report certain findings to certain persons; extending the termination date for certain provisions of law that reduce the school facilities surcharge for certain multifamily housing, exempt certain dwelling units from the school facilities surcharge, authorize the governing body of Prince George’s County to reduce the school facilities surcharge up to a certain portion for certain dwelling units, and require Prince George’s County to conduct a certain review and report its findings to certain persons on or before a certain date; and generally relating to Prince George’s County public schools. BY adding to Article – Education Section 7–452 Annotated Code of Maryland (2022 Replacement Volume and 2023 Supplement) BY repealing and reenacting, without amendments, The Public Local Laws of Prince George’s County Section 10–192.01(b–1) Article 17 – Public Local Laws of Maryland (2015 Edition and 2018 Supplement, as amended) (As enacted by Chapter 351 of the Acts of the General Assembly of 2019, as amended by Chapter 585 of the Acts of the General Assembly of 2021) BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, Chapter 351 of the Acts of the General Assembly of 2019, as amended by Chapter 585 of the Acts of the General Assembly of 2021 Section 3 and 4 Ch. 304 2024 LAWS OF MARYLAND – 2 – SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: Article – Education 7–452. (A) (1) IN THIS SECTION THE F OLLOWING WORDS HAVE THE MEANINGS INDICATED. (2) “NETWORK” MEANS A STUDENT SUPPORT SPECIALIST NETWORK. (3) “PLAN” MEANS A STUDENT SUPPORT SUCCESS ACTION PLAN. (4) “TEMPLATE” MEANS THE TEMPLATE D EVELOPED BY THE PRINCE GEORGE’S COUNTY BOARD OF EDUCATION USED BY A STUDENT SUPPORT SPECIALIST NETWORK. (B) THIS SECTION APPLIES ONLY IN PRINCE GEORGE’S COUNTY. (C) THERE IS A STUDENT SUPPORT SPECIALIST NETWORK IN EACH PUBLI C HIGH SCHOOL IN THE C OUNTY. (D) EACH NETWORK SHALL INCLUDE THE FOLLOWING MEMBER S, IF APPLICABLE: (1) THE VICE PRINCIPAL OF THE SCHOOL; (2) PROFESSIONAL SCHOOL –BASED COUNSELORS ; (3) SCHOOL–BASED PSYCHOLOGISTS ; (4) SCHOOL–BASED NURSES ; (5) LICENSED CLINICAL SOC IAL WORKERS; (6) CRISIS INTERVENTION RESOURCE TEACHERS; (7) CAREER COACHES; (8) COMMUNITY SCHOOL COOR DINATORS; (9) SCHOOL RESOURCE OFFIC ERS; AND WES MOORE, Governor Ch. 304 – 3 – (10) SCHOOL SECURITY EMPLO YEES. (E) (1) ON OR BEFORE AUGUST DECEMBER 31, 2024, THE PRINCE GEORGE’S COUNTY BOARD OF EDUCATION SHALL DEVEL OP, APPROVE, AND DISSEMINATE A TEMPLA TE FOR A STUDENT SUPPORT SUCCESS ACTION PLAN TO BE USED BY EACH NETWORK. (2) THE TEMPLATE FOR A PL AN DEVELOPED UNDER T HIS SUBSECTION SHALL INC LUDE METRICS TO MEASURE AN D CONCRETE STEPS TO ACHIEVE IMPROVEMENTS IN: (I) THE NUMBER OF STUDENT S WHO HAVE ACCESS TO BEHAVIORAL AND MENTA L HEALTH SUPPORTS ; (II) THE RATIO OF LICENSED CLINICAL SOCIAL WORK ERS, LICENSED PROFESSIONA L COUNSELORS , CRISIS INTERVENTION RESOURCE TEACHERS, AND CLINICAL THERAPI STS TO STUDENTS ; (III) REFERRALS OF STUDENTS TO MENTAL HEALTH SER VICES, NURSES, CAREER COUNSELING , AND FOOD PANTRIES ; (IV) COMMUNITY SCHOOL ASSE SSMENT RESULTS ; (V) THE USE OF RESTORATIV E APPROACHES IN ADDRESSING STUDENT MISCONDUCT ; (VI) THE USE OF TRAUMA –INFORMED APPROACHES TO A STUDENT IN DISTRESS ; (VII) THE NUMBER OF SCHOOL –BASED ARRESTS ; (VIII) THE NUMBER OF STUDENT DISCIPLINARY REFERRA LS ISSUED; (IX) THE NUMBER OF SUSPENS IONS; (X) REFERRALS TO THE DEPARTMENT OF JUVENILE SERVICES; AND (XI) THE NUMBER OF EXPULSI ONS FOR NONVIOLENT B EHAVIOR. Ch. 304 2024 LAWS OF MARYLAND – 4 – (3) IN ADDITION TO THE ME TRICS REQUIRED UNDER PARAGRAPH (2) OF THIS SUBSECTION , THE TEMPLATE FOR A P LAN DEVELOPED UNDER THIS SUBSECTION SHALL ALS O ADDRESS: (I) STRENGTHENING SCHOOL CULTURE, CLIMATE, AND COMMUNITY ; (II) FOSTERING COOPERATION AND COORDINATION BET WEEN NETWORKS; (III) ENSURING STUDENTS IN CRISIS ARE SUPPORTED ; (IV) REDUCING OUT –OF–SCHOOL SUSPENSION S AND EXPULSIONS; (V) INCREASING ACCESS TO AND KNOWLEDGE OF BEH AVIORAL HEALTH SUPPORTS ; (VI) REDUCING IN –SCHOOL VIOLENCE , GANG–RELATED ACTIVITY, AND SUBSTANCE ABUSE ; (VII) CULTIVATING POSITIVE RELATIONSHIPS OF UNDERSTANDING BETWEE N SCHOOL PERSO NNEL, SCHOOL RESOURCE OFFI CERS, SECURITY PERSONNEL , AND STUDENTS ; AND (VIII) STRENGTHENING THE NET WORK OF SERVICES FOR STUDENTS AND STAFF W HO ARE IN CRISIS. (F) SUBJECT TO SUBSECTION (G) OF THIS SECTION, EACH NETWORK SHALL COLLECTIVELY DEVELOP , COMPLETE, AND IMPLEMENT A PLAN UTILIZING THE APPROVED COUNTY BOAR D TEMPLATE. (G) (1) BEFORE IMPLEMENTING A PLAN IN ACCORDANCE W ITH SUBSECTION (F) OF THIS SECTION , EACH NETWORK SHALL SUBMIT THE PLAN TO THE COUNTY BOARD FOR APPROVAL. (2) THE DEADLINE FOR SUBM ISSION SHALL BE DETE RMINED BY THE COUNTY BOARD . (H) ON OR BEFORE JULY 1, 2025, AND ON OR BEFORE EAC H JULY 1 THEREAFTER , EACH NETWORK SHALL REPORT THE RESULTS OF THE IMPLEMENTATION OF TH E NETWORK’S PLAN TO THE COUNTY BOARD. Article 17 – Prince George’s County WES MOORE, Governor Ch. 304 – 5 – 10–192.01. (b–1) (1) The school facilities surcharge under this section shall be reduced by 50% for multi–family housing projects, with a building permit issued on or after April 1, 2019, constructed: (A) Within an approved transit district overlay zone; or (B) Where there is no approved transit district overlay zone, within one–quarter mile of a Metro station or a MARC station. (2) The school facilities surcharge under this section does not apply to a dwelling unit that is a studio apartment or an efficiency apartment if the dwelling unit is located: (A) Within the Regional Transit Districts and Local Centers (Growth Policy areas), as defined in the approved Prince George’s County General Plan (Plan 2035), including in the area of the approved 2010 Central US 1 Corridor Approved Sector Plan and Sectional Map Amendment; (B) Within an approved transit district overlay zone; or (C) Where there is no approved transit district overlay zone, within one–quarter mile of a Metro station or a MARC station. (3) The governing body of Prince George’s County may reduce the school facilities surcharge by a percentage not exceeding 50% for dwelling units in multi–family housing constructed where there is no approved transit district overlay zone, within one–quarter mile of a Purple Line station. Chapter 351 of the Acts of 2019, as amended by Chapter 585 of the Acts of 2021 SECTION 3. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That Prince George’s County shall: (1) review and make recommendations on the impact of the school facilities surcharge and the public safety surcharge and the need for any changes to the surcharges, including whether changes to the school facilities surcharge and the public safety surcharge might have a positive impact on the ability to construct and maintain affordable housing; and (2) on or before December 1, [2022] 2026, report its findings to the Prince George’s County Council, the Prince George’s County School Board, and, in accordance with § 2–1246 of the State Government Article, the members of the Prince George’s County Delegation to the General Assembly. Ch. 304 2024 LAWS OF MARYLAND – 6 – SECTION 4. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect July 1, 2019. Sections 2 and 3 of this Act shall remain effective for a period of [5] 10 years and, at the end of June 30, [2024] 2029, Sections 2 and 3 of this Act, with no further action required by the General Assembly, shall be abrogated and of no further force and effect. SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect July 1, 2024. Approved by the Governor, April 25, 2024.