Senate | 05/09/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 614 | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | Third Reading Passed (128-9) | ||
House | 03/29/2024 | Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/29/2024 | Favorable Report by Appropriations | ||
House | 03/29/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
House | 03/20/2024 | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/20/2024 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 03/20/2024 | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/16/2024 | Referred Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/15/2024 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Floor Amendment {463628/1 (Senator Hayes) Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | Motion Special Order until 3/13 (Senator A. Washington) Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/08/2024 | Motion Special Order until 3/11 (Senator Hayes) Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/07/2024 | Favorable Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 02/02/2024 | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | First Reading Finance |