Old | New | Differences | |
---|---|---|---|
1 | - | WES MOORE, Governor Ch. 614 | |
2 | 1 | ||
3 | - | – 1 – | |
4 | - | Chapter 614 | |
5 | - | (Senate Bill 764) | |
6 | 2 | ||
7 | - | AN ACT concerning | |
3 | + | EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. | |
4 | + | [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. | |
5 | + | Underlining indicates amendments to bill. | |
6 | + | Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by | |
7 | + | amendment. | |
8 | + | *sb0764* | |
8 | 9 | ||
9 | - | Arts Incubator Workgroup – Established | |
10 | + | SENATE BILL 764 | |
11 | + | C8 4lr2883 | |
12 | + | CF HB 1451 | |
13 | + | By: Senator Hayes Senators Hayes and Kagan | |
14 | + | Introduced and read first time: February 1, 2024 | |
15 | + | Assigned to: Finance | |
16 | + | Committee Report: Favorable | |
17 | + | Senate action: Adopted with floor amendments | |
18 | + | Read second time: February 29, 2024 | |
10 | 19 | ||
11 | - | FOR the purpose of establishing the Arts Incubator Workgroup to study how arts and | |
12 | - | cultural institutions can support local artists; and generally relating to the Arts | |
13 | - | Incubator Workgroup. | |
20 | + | CHAPTER ______ | |
14 | 21 | ||
15 | - | SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, | |
16 | - | That: | |
22 | + | AN ACT concerning 1 | |
17 | 23 | ||
18 | - | ||
24 | + | Arts Incubator Workgroup – Established 2 | |
19 | 25 | ||
20 | - | (b) The Workgroup consists of the following members: | |
26 | + | FOR the purpose of establishing the Arts Incubator Workgroup to study how arts and 3 | |
27 | + | cultural institutions can support local artists; and generally relating to the Arts 4 | |
28 | + | Incubator Workgroup. 5 | |
21 | 29 | ||
22 | - | (1) one individual, appointed by the President of the Senate; | |
30 | + | SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 6 | |
31 | + | That: 7 | |
23 | 32 | ||
24 | - | ( | |
33 | + | (a) There is an Arts Incubator Workgroup. 8 | |
25 | 34 | ||
26 | - | ( | |
35 | + | (b) The Workgroup consists of the following members: 9 | |
27 | 36 | ||
28 | - | ( | |
37 | + | (1) one individual, appointed by the President of the Senate; 10 | |
29 | 38 | ||
30 | - | ( | |
39 | + | (2) one individual, appointed by the Speaker of the House; and 11 | |
31 | 40 | ||
32 | - | (iii) one representative of an arts entity that can accommodate an | |
33 | - | audience of at least 50 people but not more than 250 people; | |
41 | + | (3) the following members, appointed by the Governor: 12 | |
34 | 42 | ||
35 | - | ( | |
43 | + | (i) two three artists; 13 | |
36 | 44 | ||
37 | - | ( | |
45 | + | (ii) one artist who is an arts educator; 14 | |
38 | 46 | ||
39 | - | ( | |
40 | - | ||
47 | + | (iii) one representative of an arts entity that can accommodate an 15 | |
48 | + | audience of at least 50 people but not more than 250 people; 16 2 SENATE BILL 764 | |
41 | 49 | ||
42 | - | (vii) one representative of an arts entity that can accommodate an | |
43 | - | audience of more than 250 people; and | |
44 | 50 | ||
45 | - | (vi) (viii) two members of the public who support the arts. | |
46 | 51 | ||
47 | - | (c) The Chair of the Workgroup shall be selected by the Governor from among the | |
48 | - | members of the Workgroup. | |
49 | - | Ch. 614 2024 LAWS OF MARYLAND | |
52 | + | (iv) two members of local arts councils; 1 | |
50 | 53 | ||
51 | - | – 2 – | |
52 | - | (d) The Maryland State Arts Council shall provide staff for the Workgroup. | |
54 | + | (v) one member of the Maryland State Arts Council; 2 | |
53 | 55 | ||
54 | - | (e) A member of the Workgroup: | |
56 | + | (vi) two members of local arts districts, each from a different 3 | |
57 | + | geographical area of the State; 4 | |
55 | 58 | ||
56 | - | (1) may not receive compensation as a member of the Workgroup; but | |
59 | + | (vii) one representative of an arts entity that can accommodate an 5 | |
60 | + | audience of more than 250 people; and 6 | |
57 | 61 | ||
58 | - | (2) is entitled to reimbursement for expenses under the Standard State | |
59 | - | Travel Regulations, as provided in the State budget. | |
62 | + | (vi) (viii) two members of the public who support the arts. 7 | |
60 | 63 | ||
61 | - | ( | |
62 | - | ||
64 | + | (c) The Chair of the Workgroup shall be selected by the Governor from among the 8 | |
65 | + | members of the Workgroup. 9 | |
63 | 66 | ||
64 | - | (g) (1) On or before October 1, 2024 January 1, 2025, the Workgroup shall | |
65 | - | submit a preliminary report on its recommendations, including any necessary budget, | |
66 | - | facilities, or in–kind services that are needed or could be used to support local artists | |
67 | - | findings, including research, case studies, and examples of approaches used to support | |
68 | - | artists in other areas, to the Governor and, in accordance with § 2–1257 of the State | |
69 | - | Government Article, the General Assembly. | |
67 | + | (d) The Maryland State Arts Council shall provide staff for the Workgroup. 10 | |
70 | 68 | ||
71 | - | (2) On or before October 1, 2025, the Workgroup shall submit a final report | |
72 | - | on its recommendations, including any necessary budget, facilities, or in–kind services that | |
73 | - | are needed or could be used to support local artists to the Governor and, in accordance with | |
74 | - | § 2–1257 of the State Government Article, the General Assembly. | |
69 | + | (e) A member of the Workgroup: 11 | |
75 | 70 | ||
76 | - | SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect July | |
77 | - | 1, 2024. It shall remain effective for a period of 1 year and 6 months and, at the end of | |
78 | - | December 31, 2025, this Act, with no further action required by the General Assembly, shall | |
79 | - | be abrogated and of no further force and effect. | |
71 | + | (1) may not receive compensation as a member of the Workgroup; but 12 | |
80 | 72 | ||
81 | - | Approved by the Governor, May 9, 2024. | |
73 | + | (2) is entitled to reimbursement for expenses under the Standard State 13 | |
74 | + | Travel Regulations, as provided in the State budget. 14 | |
75 | + | ||
76 | + | (f) The Workgroup shall study how arts and cultural institutions can support 15 | |
77 | + | local artists. 16 | |
78 | + | ||
79 | + | (g) (1) On or before October 1, 2024 January 1, 2025, the Workgroup shall 17 | |
80 | + | submit a preliminary report on its recommendations, including any necessary budget, 18 | |
81 | + | facilities, or in–kind services that are needed or could be used to support local artists 19 | |
82 | + | findings, including research, case studies, and examples of approaches used to support 20 | |
83 | + | artists in other areas, to the Governor and, in accordance with § 2–1257 of the State 21 | |
84 | + | Government Article, the General Assembly. 22 | |
85 | + | ||
86 | + | (2) On or before October 1, 2025, the Workgroup shall submit a final report 23 | |
87 | + | on its recommendations, including any necessary budget, facilities, or in–kind services that 24 | |
88 | + | are needed or could be used to support local artists to the Governor and, in accordance with 25 | |
89 | + | § 2–1257 of the State Government Article, the General Assembly. 26 | |
90 | + | ||
91 | + | SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect July 27 | |
92 | + | 1, 2024. It shall remain effective for a period of 1 year and 6 months and, at the end of 28 | |
93 | + | December 31, 2025, this Act, with no further action required by the General Assembly, shall 29 | |
94 | + | be abrogated and of no further force and effect. 30 | |
95 | + |