WES MOORE, Governor Ch. 614 – 1 – Chapter 614 (Senate Bill 764) AN ACT concerning Arts Incubator Workgroup – Established FOR the purpose of establishing the Arts Incubator Workgroup to study how arts and cultural institutions can support local artists; and generally relating to the Arts Incubator Workgroup. SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, That: (a) There is an Arts Incubator Workgroup. (b) The Workgroup consists of the following members: (1) one individual, appointed by the President of the Senate; (2) one individual, appointed by the Speaker of the House; and (3) the following members, appointed by the Governor: (i) two three artists; (ii) one artist who is an arts educator; (iii) one representative of an arts entity that can accommodate an audience of at least 50 people but not more than 250 people; (iv) two members of local arts councils; (v) one member of the Maryland State Arts Council; (vi) two members of local arts districts, each from a different geographical area of the State; (vii) one representative of an arts entity that can accommodate an audience of more than 250 people; and (vi) (viii) two members of the public who support the arts. (c) The Chair of the Workgroup shall be selected by the Governor from among the members of the Workgroup. Ch. 614 2024 LAWS OF MARYLAND – 2 – (d) The Maryland State Arts Council shall provide staff for the Workgroup. (e) A member of the Workgroup: (1) may not receive compensation as a member of the Workgroup; but (2) is entitled to reimbursement for expenses under the Standard State Travel Regulations, as provided in the State budget. (f) The Workgroup shall study how arts and cultural institutions can support local artists. (g) (1) On or before October 1, 2024 January 1, 2025, the Workgroup shall submit a preliminary report on its recommendations, including any necessary budget, facilities, or in–kind services that are needed or could be used to support local artists findings, including research, case studies, and examples of approaches used to support artists in other areas, to the Governor and, in accordance with § 2–1257 of the State Government Article, the General Assembly. (2) On or before October 1, 2025, the Workgroup shall submit a final report on its recommendations, including any necessary budget, facilities, or in–kind services that are needed or could be used to support local artists to the Governor and, in accordance with § 2–1257 of the State Government Article, the General Assembly. SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect July 1, 2024. It shall remain effective for a period of 1 year and 6 months and, at the end of December 31, 2025, this Act, with no further action required by the General Assembly, shall be abrogated and of no further force and effect. Approved by the Governor, May 9, 2024.