Senate | 05/09/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 647 | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Passed Enrolled | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Senate Concurs House Amendments | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | Third Reading Passed (135-1) | ||
House | 04/06/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {843227/1 Adopted | ||
House | 04/06/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 04/06/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | Hearing 4/02 at 2:00 p.m. | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | Hearing 4/02 at 1:30 p.m. | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 03/21/2024 | Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/19/2024 | Referred Environment and Transportation | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 03/15/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {583621/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/15/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/02/2024 | First Reading Finance |