Maryland 2024 Regular Session

Maryland Senate Bill SB891 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 05/15/2024

                             	WES MOORE, Governor 	Ch. 647 
 
– 1 – 
Chapter 647 
(Senate Bill 891) 
 
AN ACT concerning 
 
Transportation – MobilityLink Paratransit Service Improvements – Study 
 
FOR the purpose of requiring the Maryland Transportation Institute at the University of 
Maryland to conduct a study to identify methods to improve the Maryland Transit 
Administration’s ADA MobilityLink paratransit service; and generally relating to 
the study to identify methods to improve the Administration’s ADA MobilityLink 
paratransit service. 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 
That: 
 
 (a) (1) In this section the following words have the meanings indicated. 
 
 (2) “ADA” means the federal Americans with Disabilities Act. 
 
 (3) “Administration” means the Maryland Transit Administration. 
 
 (b) The Maryland Transportation Institute at the University of Maryland shall 
conduct a study to identify methods to improve the Maryland Transit Administration’s 
ADA MobilityLink paratransit service. 
 
 (c) The study shall: 
 
 (1) summarize and compare the Administration’s MobilityLink service to 
similar entities nationwide that provide ADA paratransit services; 
 
 (2) identify the service structure of ADA paratransit services in other 
service areas nationwide and whether a public entity, private contractor, or hybrid model 
is used to provide the service, including consideration of how the following services are 
provided: 
 
 (i) fleet ownership; 
 
 (ii) fleet maintenance; 
 
 (iii) dispatch; 
 
 (iv) reservations; 
 
 (v) scheduling; 
  Ch. 647 	2024 LAWS OF MARYLAND  
 
– 2 – 
 (vi) operators; 
 
 (vii) mechanics; 
 
 (viii) customer service; 
 
 (ix) quality assurance and control; and 
 
 (x) any other relevant aspects as the Maryland Transportation 
Institute deems necessary; 
 
 (3) analyze both the short– and long–term fiscal costs and savings 
associated with each type of ADA paratransit service model, including a comparison of the 
quality of service and reliability of each service model; 
 
 (4) analyze the performance metrics associated with the ADA paratransit 
services in various service areas nationwide based on the Federal Transit Administration’s 
ADA Guidance for metrics, including: 
 
 (i) on–time performance for pick–ups and drop–offs; 
 
 (ii) missed trips; 
 
 (iii) onboard transit times; 
 
 (iv) excessive trip lengths; 
 
 (v) call center hold times and performance; 
 
 (vi) rate of customer complaints and resolution; and 
 
 (vii) safety conditions and practices on paratransit vehicles; 
 
 (5) analyze the workforce metrics among the ADA paratransit services in 
various service areas nationwide, including: 
 
 (i) turnover rate; 
 
 (ii) average length of employment; 
 
 (iii) absenteeism rate; 
 
 (iv) accidents and preventable accident rates; 
 
 (v) workplace injury rates; 
   	WES MOORE, Governor 	Ch. 647 
 
– 3 – 
 (vi) workers’ compensation claims rates; 
 
 (vii) career training opportunities; 
 
 (viii) career advancement opportunities; 
 
 (ix) average wages and benefits; 
 
 (x) morale and satisfaction; and 
 
 (xi) any other relevant aspects as the Maryland Transportation 
Institute deems necessary; 
 
 (6) in consultation with the Maryland Commission on Disabilities and the 
State Coordinating Committee for Human Services Transportation, solicit input and 
comments from the public and riders of the Administration’s MobilityLink paratransit 
service; and 
 
 (7) develop recommendations for service improvements to the 
Administration’s MobilityLink paratransit service, considering long–term costs and 
benefits alongside a qualitative analysis to enhance the delivery of high–quality service to 
MobilityLink riders; 
 
 (8) develop recommendations for service improvements to individuals 
located at least three–quarters of a mile from in areas outside of three–quarters of a mile of 
a fixed transportation route; and 
 
 (9) develop recommendations to address interjurisdictional restrictions to 
paratransit services, including restrictions relating to medical appointments that cross 
jurisdictional lines. 
 
 (d) The Governor may include in the fiscal year 2026 budget bill an appropriation 
of at least $150,000 for the purpose of carrying out the study required under subsection (b) 
of this section. 
 
 (e) On or before July 1, 2025, the Maryland Transportation Institute shall submit 
a report on its findings and recommendations to: 
 
 (1) the Governor; 
 
 (2) in accordance with § 2–1257 of the State Government Article: 
 
 (i) the General Assembly; 
 
 (ii) the members of the Anne Arundel County Delegation to the 
Maryland General Assembly;  Ch. 647 	2024 LAWS OF MARYLAND  
 
– 4 – 
 
 (iii) the members of the Baltimore County D elegation to the 
Maryland General Assembly; and 
 
 (iv) the members of the Baltimore City Delegation to the Maryland 
General Assembly; 
 
 (3) the County Executive and County Council of Anne Arundel County; 
 
 (4) the County Executive and County Council of Baltimore County; and 
 
 (5) the Maryland Department of Transportation; and  
 
 (5) (6) the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City. 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect July 
1, 2024. It shall remain effective for a period of 1 year and 6 months 2 years and, at the end 
of December 31, 2025 June 30, 2026, this Act, with no further action required by the 
General Assembly, shall be abrogated and of no further force and effect. 
 
Approved by the Governor, May 9, 2024.