House | 03/16/2024 | Referred Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/15/2024 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Floor Amendment {543324/1 (Senator Ready) Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Ready) Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/02/2024 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |