Maryland 2024 Regular Session

Maryland Senate Bill SB965 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11
22
33 EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTING LAW.
44 [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law.
5- Underlining indicates amendments to bill.
6- Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by
7-amendment.
85 *sb0965*
96
107 SENATE BILL 965
118 D2 4lr2205
129 CF HB 1060
1310 By: Carroll County Senators
1411 Introduced and read first time: February 2, 2024
1512 Assigned to: Judicial Proceedings
16-Committee Report: Favorable
17-Senate action: Adopted
18-Read second time: February 27, 2024
1913
20-CHAPTER ______
14+A BILL ENTITLED
2115
2216 AN ACT concerning 1
2317
2418 Carroll County – Sheriff – Salary 2
2519
2620 FOR the purpose of altering the annual salary of the Sheriff of Carroll County to be equal 3
2721 to the salary of a Department of State Police lieutenant colonel, at the highest 4
2822 available step for a lieutenant colonel under the Department of State Police pay plan 5
2923 beginning in a certain year; providing for a certain change in the annual salary of 6
3024 the Sheriff of Carroll County under certain circumstances; and generally relating to 7
3125 the salary of the Sheriff of Carroll County. 8
3226
3327 BY repealing and reenacting, without amendments, 9
3428 Article – Courts and Judicial Proceedings 10
3529 Section 2–320(a) 11
3630 Annotated Code of Maryland 12
3731 (2020 Replacement Volume and 2023 Supplement) 13
3832
3933 BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 14
4034 Article – Courts and Judicial Proceedings 15
4135 Section 2–320(b) 16
4236 Annotated Code of Maryland 17
4337 (2020 Replacement Volume and 2023 Supplement) 18
4438
4539 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 19
4640 That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 20
4741
48-Article – Courts and Judicial Proceedings 21 2 SENATE BILL 965
42+Article – Courts and Judicial Proceedings 21
43+
44+2–320. 22
45+
46+ (a) This section applies only in Carroll County. 23
47+ 2 SENATE BILL 965
4948
5049
50+ (b) (1) The Sheriff of Carroll County shall receive an annual salary of[: 1
5151
52-2–320. 1
52+ (1) $110,000 beginning December 3, 2019; 2
5353
54- (a) This section applies only in Carroll County. 2
54+ (2) $125,000 beginning December 6, 2022; and 3
5555
56- (b) (1) The Sheriff of Carroll County shall receive an annual salary of[: 3
56+ (3)] $140,000 beginning December 5, 2023[, and thereafter]. 4
5757
58- (1) $110,000 beginning December 3, 2019; 4
58+ (2) BEGINNING IN 2026, THE SALARY FOR THE SHERIFF SHALL BE 5
59+EQUAL TO THE SALARY OF A DEPARTMENT OF STATE POLICE LIEUTENANT 6
60+COLONEL, AT THE HIGHEST AVAIL ABLE STEP FOR A LIEU TENANT COLONEL AT TH E 7
61+DEPARTMENT OF STATE POLICE PAY PLAN IN EF FECT ON THE DAY BEFORE THE D AY 8
62+THAT THE SHERIFF BEGINS THE NEW TERM OF OFFICE . 9
5963
60- (2) $125,000 beginning December 6, 2022; and 5
64+ (3) BEGINNING IN 2030 AND EVERY 4 YEARS THEREAFTER , THE 10
65+SALARY OF THE SHERIFF OF CARROLL COUNTY SHALL BE THE LESSER OF: 11
6166
62- (3)] $140,000 beginning December 5, 2023[, and thereafter]. 6
67+ (I) THE SALARY OF A DEPARTMENT OF STATE POLICE 12
68+LIEUTENANT COLONEL, AT THE HIGHEST AVAIL ABLE STEP FOR A LIEU TENANT 13
69+COLONEL AT THE DEPARTMENT OF STATE POLICE PAY PLAN IN EF FECT ON THE DAY 14
70+BEFORE THE DAY THAT THE SHERIFF BEGINS A TERM OF OFFICE IN THAT YEAR; OR 15
6371
64- (2) BEGINNING IN 2026, THE SALARY FOR THE SHERIFF SHALL BE 7
65-EQUAL TO THE SALARY OF A DEPARTMENT OF STATE POLICE LIEUTENANT 8
66-COLONEL, AT THE HIGHEST AVAIL ABLE STEP FOR A LIEU TENANT COLONEL AT TH E 9
67-DEPARTMENT OF STATE POLICE PAY PLAN IN EF FECT ON THE DAY BEFORE THE D AY 10
68-THAT THE SHERIFF BEGINS THE NEW TERM OF OFFICE. 11
72+ (II) A 110% OF THE SALARY OF THE SHERIFF ON THE DAY 16
73+BEFORE THE DAY THAT THE SHERIFF BEGINS A NEW TERM OF OFFICE . 17
6974
70- (3) BEGINNING IN 2030 AND EVERY 4 YEARS THEREAFTER , THE 12
71-SALARY OF THE SHERIFF OF CARROLL COUNTY SHALL BE THE LESSER OF: 13
75+ (4) ANY CHANGE IN THE SAL ARY PAID UNDER THE DEPARTMENT OF 18
76+STATE POLICE PAY PLAN DURIN G THE TERM OF OFFICE OF THE SHERIFF MAY NOT 19
77+APPLY TO THE INCUMBE NT SHERIFF, BUT THE CHANGED RATE SHALL TAKE EFFECT 20
78+AT THE BEGINNING OF THE NEXT FOLLOWING T ERM OF OFFICE. 21
7279
73- (I) THE SALARY OF A DEPARTMENT OF STATE POLICE 14
74-LIEUTENANT COLONEL, AT THE HIGHEST AVAIL ABLE STEP FOR A LIEU TENANT 15
75-COLONEL AT THE DEPARTMENT OF STATE POLICE PAY PLAN IN EF FECT ON THE DAY 16
76-BEFORE THE DAY THAT THE SHERIFF BEGINS A TERM OF OFFICE IN THAT YEAR; OR 17
80+ SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That, in accordance with Article 22
81+III, § 35 of the Maryland Constitution, this Act may not be construed to extend or apply to 23
82+the salary or compensation of the Sheriff of Carroll County while serving in a term of office 24
83+beginning before the effective date of this Act, but the provisions of this Act concerning the 25
84+salary or compensation of the Sheriff of Carroll County shall take effect at the beginning of 26
85+the next following term of office. This limitation does not apply to an individual appointed 27
86+or elected after the effective date of this Act to fill out an unexpired term. 28
7787
78- (II) A 110% OF THE SALARY OF THE SHERIFF ON THE DAY 18
79-BEFORE THE DAY THAT THE SHERIFF BEGINS A NEW TERM OF OFFICE . 19
80-
81- (4) ANY CHANGE IN THE SAL ARY PAID UNDER THE DEPARTMENT OF 20
82-STATE POLICE PAY PLAN DURIN G THE TERM OF OFFICE OF THE SHERIFF MAY NOT 21
83-APPLY TO THE INCUMBE NT SHERIFF, BUT THE CHANGED RATE SHALL TAKE EFFECT 22
84-AT THE BEGINNING OF THE NEXT FOLLOWING T ERM OF OFFICE. 23
85-
86- SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That, in accordance with Article 24
87-III, § 35 of the Maryland Constitution, this Act may not be construed to extend or apply to 25
88-the salary or compensation of the Sheriff of Carroll County while serving in a term of office 26
89-beginning before the effective date of this Act, but the provisions of this Act concerning the 27
90-salary or compensation of the Sheriff of Carroll County shall take effect at the beginning of 28
91-the next following term of office. This limitation does not apply to an individual appointed 29
92-or elected after the effective date of this Act to fill out an unexpired term. 30
93-
94- SECTION 3. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect 31
95-October 1, 2024. 32
88+ SECTION 3. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect 29
89+October 1, 2024. 30