Maryland 2024 Regular Session

Maryland Senate Bill SB965 Latest Draft

Bill / Engrossed Version Filed 03/12/2024

                             
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
         Underlining indicates amendments to bill. 
         Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by 
amendment. 
          *sb0965*  
  
SENATE BILL 965 
D2   	4lr2205 
    	CF HB 1060 
By: Carroll County Senators 
Introduced and read first time: February 2, 2024 
Assigned to: Judicial Proceedings 
Committee Report: Favorable 
Senate action: Adopted 
Read second time: February 27, 2024 
 
CHAPTER ______ 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Carroll County – Sheriff – Salary 2 
 
FOR the purpose of altering the annual salary of the Sheriff of Carroll County to be equal 3 
to the salary of a Department of State Police lieutenant colonel, at the highest 4 
available step for a lieutenant colonel under the Department of State Police pay plan 5 
beginning in a certain year; providing for a certain change in the annual salary of 6 
the Sheriff of Carroll County under certain circumstances; and generally relating to 7 
the salary of the Sheriff of Carroll County. 8 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, without amendments, 9 
 Article – Courts and Judicial Proceedings 10 
Section 2–320(a) 11 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 12 
 (2020 Replacement Volume and 2023 Supplement) 13 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 14 
 Article – Courts and Judicial Proceedings 15 
Section 2–320(b) 16 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 17 
 (2020 Replacement Volume and 2023 Supplement) 18 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 19 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 20 
 
Article – Courts and Judicial Proceedings 21  2 	SENATE BILL 965  
 
 
 
2–320. 1 
 
 (a) This section applies only in Carroll County. 2 
 
 (b) (1) The Sheriff of Carroll County shall receive an annual salary of[: 3 
 
 (1) $110,000 beginning December 3, 2019; 4 
 
 (2) $125,000 beginning December 6, 2022; and 5 
 
 (3)] $140,000 beginning December 5, 2023[, and thereafter]. 6 
 
 (2) BEGINNING IN 2026, THE SALARY FOR THE SHERIFF SHALL BE 7 
EQUAL TO THE SALARY OF A DEPARTMENT OF STATE POLICE LIEUTENANT 8 
COLONEL, AT THE HIGHEST AVAIL ABLE STEP FOR A LIEU TENANT COLONEL AT TH E 9 
DEPARTMENT OF STATE POLICE PAY PLAN IN EF FECT ON THE DAY BEFORE THE D AY 10 
THAT THE SHERIFF BEGINS THE NEW TERM OF OFFICE. 11 
 
 (3) BEGINNING IN 2030 AND EVERY 4 YEARS THEREAFTER , THE 12 
SALARY OF THE SHERIFF OF CARROLL COUNTY SHALL BE THE LESSER OF: 13 
 
 (I) THE SALARY OF A DEPARTMENT OF STATE POLICE 14 
LIEUTENANT COLONEL, AT THE HIGHEST AVAIL ABLE STEP FOR A LIEU TENANT 15 
COLONEL AT THE DEPARTMENT OF STATE POLICE PAY PLAN IN EF FECT ON THE DAY 16 
BEFORE THE DAY THAT THE SHERIFF BEGINS A TERM OF OFFICE IN THAT YEAR; OR 17 
 
 (II) A 110% OF THE SALARY OF THE SHERIFF ON THE DAY 18 
BEFORE THE DAY THAT THE SHERIFF BEGINS A NEW TERM OF OFFICE . 19 
 
 (4) ANY CHANGE IN THE SAL ARY PAID UNDER THE DEPARTMENT OF 20 
STATE POLICE PAY PLAN DURIN G THE TERM OF OFFICE OF THE SHERIFF MAY NOT 21 
APPLY TO THE INCUMBE NT SHERIFF, BUT THE CHANGED RATE SHALL TAKE EFFECT 22 
AT THE BEGINNING OF THE NEXT FOLLOWING T ERM OF OFFICE. 23 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That, in accordance with Article 24 
III, § 35 of the Maryland Constitution, this Act may not be construed to extend or apply to 25 
the salary or compensation of the Sheriff of Carroll County while serving in a term of office 26 
beginning before the effective date of this Act, but the provisions of this Act concerning the 27 
salary or compensation of the Sheriff of Carroll County shall take effect at the beginning of 28 
the next following term of office. This limitation does not apply to an individual appointed 29 
or elected after the effective date of this Act to fill out an unexpired term. 30 
 
 SECTION 3. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect 31 
October 1, 2024. 32