House | 04/07/2025 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Senate Recede | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | House Requests Senate Recede | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Favorable with Amendments {263921/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
House | 03/17/2025 | Third Reading Passed (137-0) | ||
House | 03/14/2025 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/14/2025 | Favorable Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 02/12/2025 | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/12/2025 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 02/04/2025 | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/24/2025 | First Reading Ways and Means |