House
|
10/15/2024
|
Assigned Pa 125'24 With Immediate Effect
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2024
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 10/03/2024 03:02 Pm
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2024
|
Approved By The Governor 10/03/2024 02:12 Pm
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2024
|
Presented To The Governor 10/02/2024 03:08 Pm
|
|
|
House
|
09/25/2024
|
Bill Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
09/25/2024
|
Full Title Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
09/25/2024
|
Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/25/2024
|
Inserted Full Title
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/25/2024
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 347 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/25/2024
|
Placed On Immediate Passage
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/25/2024
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/25/2024
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/25/2024
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/19/2024
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/19/2024
|
Reported Favorably Without Amendment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Referred To Committee On Veterans And Emergency Services
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
Transmitted
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 54 Yeas 56 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 53
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/13/2024
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Referred To Committee On Transportation, Mobility And Infrastructure
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Introduced By Representative Carol Glanville
|
|
|