Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HB5434 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 13, 2024

Engrossed

Bill September 25, 2024
Bill May 7, 2024

Enrolled

Bill October 3, 2024

Chaptered

Bill October 4, 2024