Senate | 08/22/2023 | Assigned Pa 0104'23 | ||
Senate | 08/22/2023 | Filed With Secretary Of State 07/27/2023 09:40 Am | ||
Senate | 08/22/2023 | Approved By Governor 07/26/2023 11:52 Am | ||
Senate | 07/18/2023 | Presented To Governor 07/17/2023 10:53 Am | ||
Senate | 06/28/2023 | Ordered Enrolled | ||
Senate | 06/28/2023 | Full Title Agreed To | ||
House | 06/28/2023 | Returned To Senate | ||
House | 06/28/2023 | Inserted Full Title | ||
House | 06/28/2023 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 260 Yeas 56 Nays 52 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 | ||
House | 06/28/2023 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 06/27/2023 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 06/27/2023 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 06/22/2023 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 06/22/2023 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | ||
House | 05/17/2023 | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources, Environment, Tourism And Outdoor Recreation | ||
House | 05/17/2023 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 05/17/2023 | Received On 05/17/2023 | ||
Senate | 05/17/2023 | Passed Roll Call # 295 Yeas 20 Nays 18 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 | ||
Senate | 05/17/2023 | Amendment(s) Defeated | ||
Senate | 05/17/2023 | Substitute (s-2) Defeated | ||
Senate | 05/16/2023 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading | ||
Senate | 05/16/2023 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Reported Favorably Without Amendment | ||
Senate | 01/17/2023 | Referred To Committee On Energy And Environment | ||
Senate | 01/17/2023 | Introduced By Senator Sean Mccann |