Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan Senate Bill SB0014 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2023

Engrossed

Bill June 28, 2023
Bill May 17, 2023

Enrolled

Bill July 17, 2023

Chaptered

Bill August 1, 2023