Senate | 04/28/2023 | Comm report: To pass as amended | ||
Senate | 04/28/2023 | Second reading | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Referred to Finance | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Introduction and first reading | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Received from House | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Bill was passed as amended | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Third reading as amended | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Amended | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, April 24, 2023 | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Committee report, to adopt as amended | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Author added Hornstein | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means | ||
House | 02/02/2023 | Authors added Feist and Finke | ||
House | 01/18/2023 | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law | ||
House | 01/17/2023 | Authors added Hussein and Hemmingsen-Jaeger | ||
House | 01/09/2023 | Author added Jordan | ||
House | 01/05/2023 | Author added Hortman | ||
House | 01/04/2023 | Introduction and first reading, referred to Labor and Industry Finance and Policy |