Minnesota 2023-2024 Regular Session

Minnesota House Bill HF36 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 4, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 24, 2023
Bill March 30, 2023
Bill February 6, 2023
Bill January 18, 2023