House
|
06/29/2022
|
Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
|
|
|
House
|
06/29/2022
|
Approved by Governor (G)
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2022
|
Delivered to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2022
|
Signed by President Pro Tem (S)
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2022
|
Signed by House Speaker (H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2022
|
Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 109 NOES: 34 PRESENT: 3
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2022
|
House Adopts Conference Committee Report (H) - AYES: 107 NOES: 34 PRESENT: 4
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2022
|
House Submits Conference Committee Report (H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2022
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2022
|
Bill Reconsidered (H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2022
|
Senate Message (S)
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2022
|
Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2022
|
Executive Session Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2022
|
Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 30 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2022
|
Senate Adopts Conference Committee Report (S) - AYES: 30 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2022
|
Senate Submits Conference Committee Report (S)
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2022
|
Motion to Do Pass Failed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2022
|
House Message (H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2022
|
House Distributes Conference Committee Report (H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2022
|
Referred: Fiscal Review(H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2022
|
House Conference Committee Appointed (H) - REPRESENTATIVES MCGAUGH, FITZWATER, O'DONNELL, BARINGER, ADAMS
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2022
|
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (S) - ESLINGER, CRAWFORD, THOMPSON REHDER, RAZER, BECK
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2022
|
Senate Refuses to Recede, Grants Conference (S)
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2022
|
House Refuses to Adopt, Requests Senate to Recede or Grant Conference (H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2022
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 4 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2022
|
Reported to the House with... (H) - SS SCS, as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2022
|
Taken Up
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2022
|
Third Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 1, SA 2, SA 1 to SA 3, SA 3, as amended, SA 4, SA 5, SA 6, SA 7, SA 8, SA 9, SA 10, SA 11, SA 12, SA 13, SA 14, SA 17, SA 18, SA 19, SA 21, SA 23, adopted. AYES: 20 NOES: 11 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
Reported Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
Voted Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
Executive Session Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Executive Session Scheduled - Monday, May 2, 2022, 1:30 p.m., Senate Committee Room 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Referred: Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
SS Adopted (S) - SA 1, SA 2, SA 1 to SA 3, SA 3, as amended, SA 4, SA 5, SA 6, SA 7, SA 8, SA 9, SA 10, SA 11, SA 12, SA 13, SA 14, SA 17, SA 18, SA 19, SA 21, SA 23, adopted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
SS Offered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Taken Up for Third Reading (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Placed on Informal Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
SCS Reported Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2022
|
SCS Voted Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
Public Hearing Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 6, 2022, 12:00 p.m., Senate Committee Room 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2022
|
Second read and referred: Local Government and Elections(S)
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
Reported to the Senate and First Read (S)
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 148 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
Taken Up for Third Reading (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Reported Do Pass - Consent (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Voted Do Pass - Consent (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Referred: Consent and House Procedure(H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
HCS Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
HCS Voted Do Pass - Consent (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
Public Hearing Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2022
|
Referred: Local Government(H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/06/2022
|
Read Second Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/05/2022
|
Read First Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
12/01/2021
|
Prefiled (H)
|
|
|