Missouri 2022 Regular Session

Missouri House Bill HB1606 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note June 3, 2022
Fiscal Note May 11, 2022
Fiscal Note May 1, 2022
Fiscal Note April 21, 2022
Fiscal Note March 22, 2022
Fiscal Note February 25, 2022
Fiscal Note January 28, 2022
Bill December 1, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 22, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 13, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis May 13, 2022
Bill April 20, 2022
Analysis March 22, 2022
Analysis February 25, 2022
Bill February 24, 2022
Analysis December 10, 2021

Conference Sub

Bill May 10, 2022

Substitute

Bill April 27, 2022