House
|
06/30/2022
|
Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
|
|
|
House
|
06/30/2022
|
Approved by Governor (G)
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2022
|
Delivered to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2022
|
Signed by President Pro Tem (S)
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2022
|
Signed by House Speaker (H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2022
|
House Message (H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2022
|
Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 94 NOES: 43 PRESENT: 2
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2022
|
House Adopts (H) - SS, as amended AYES: 95 NOES: 41 PRESENT: 5
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2022
|
Taken Up
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2022
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2022
|
Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2022
|
Referred: Fiscal Review(H)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2022
|
Reported to the House with... (H) - SS, as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2022
|
Executive Session Completed (H)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2022
|
Third Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 1 and SA 2, adopted. AYES: 29 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2022
|
SS Adopted (S) - SA 1 and SA 2, adopted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2022
|
SS Offered
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2022
|
Taken Up for Third Reading (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
Reported Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Voted Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Executive Session Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Public Hearing Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 27, 2022, 8:30 a.m., Senate Committee Room 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2022
|
Second read and referred: Local Government and Elections(S)
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2022
|
Reported to the Senate and First Read (S)
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2022
|
Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 124 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 17
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2022
|
Taken Up for Third Reading (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2022
|
Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Reported Do Pass - Consent (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Voted Do Pass - Consent (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Referred: Consent and House Procedure(H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
HCS Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
HCS Voted Do Pass - Consent (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2022
|
Public Hearing Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
Referred: Judiciary(H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/06/2022
|
Read Second Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/05/2022
|
Read First Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
12/01/2021
|
Prefiled (H)
|
|
|