LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Missouri MO
Legislatures
2022 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB1662
Draft Versions
MO
Missouri House Bill HB1662
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Missouri 2022 Regular Session
Missouri House Bill HB1662
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Fiscal Note
June 3, 2022
Fiscal Note
May 11, 2022
Fiscal Note
March 29, 2022
Fiscal Note
February 25, 2022
Fiscal Note
February 14, 2022
Bill
December 1, 2021
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
March 29, 2022
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
May 13, 2022
Compare
Comm Sub
Analysis
May 17, 2022
Analysis
April 1, 2022
Analysis
February 25, 2022
Bill
February 24, 2022
Compare
Analysis
December 21, 2021
Substitute
Bill
May 10, 2022
Compare