Missouri 2022 Regular Session

Missouri House Bill HB1694 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note January 25, 2022
Fiscal Note January 4, 2022
Bill December 1, 2021

Comm Sub

Analysis January 31, 2022
Bill January 25, 2022
Analysis December 10, 2021