Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Placed on Informal Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
SCS Reported Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2022
|
SCS Voted Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2022
|
Executive Session Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2022
|
Public Hearing Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 12, 2022, 10:00 a.m or upon conclusion of Economic Development (whichever is later), Senate Lounge.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2022
|
Second read and referred: Education(S)
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
Reported to the Senate and First Read (S)
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 147 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
Taken Up for Third Reading (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2022
|
Perfected (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2022
|
Title of Bill - Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2022
|
Taken Up for Perfection (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Executive Session Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2022
|
Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2022
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 15 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2022
|
Public Hearing Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2022
|
Referred: General Laws(H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/06/2022
|
Read Second Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/05/2022
|
Read First Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
12/07/2021
|
Prefiled (H)
|
|
|