LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Missouri MO
Legislatures
2022 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB1856
Draft Versions
MO
Missouri House Bill HB1856
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Missouri 2022 Regular Session
Missouri House Bill HB1856
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Fiscal Note
April 21, 2022
Fiscal Note
March 21, 2022
Fiscal Note
January 30, 2022
Bill
December 7, 2021
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
March 21, 2022
Compare
Comm Sub
Bill
April 20, 2022
Compare
Analysis
March 22, 2022
Analysis
February 9, 2022
Analysis
December 29, 2021