Missouri 2022 Regular Session

Missouri House Bill HB1858 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 13, 2022
Fiscal Note March 1, 2022
Fiscal Note February 11, 2022
Bill December 7, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 13, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis April 14, 2022
Analysis February 25, 2022
Bill February 24, 2022
Analysis December 29, 2021