House
|
06/29/2022
|
Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
|
|
|
House
|
06/29/2022
|
Approved by Governor (G)
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2022
|
Delivered to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2022
|
Signed by President Pro Tem (S)
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2022
|
Signed by House Speaker (H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2022
|
Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 97 NOES: 47 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2022
|
House Adopts (H) - SS SCS, as amended AYES: 97 NOES: 47 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2022
|
Taken Up
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2022
|
House Message (H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2022
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2022
|
Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2022
|
Executive Session Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2022
|
Referred: Fiscal Review(H)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2022
|
Reported to the House with... (H) - SS, as amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2022
|
Third Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 2, SA 1 to SA 3, SA 3, as amended, SA 1 to SA 6, SA 6, as amended, SA 7, SA 8, SA 9, and SA 10, adopted. AYES: 23 NOES: 11 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2022
|
Executive Session Scheduled - Monday, May 9, 2022, 1:00 p.m., Senate Committee Room 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2022
|
Reported Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2022
|
Voted Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2022
|
Executive Session Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2022
|
SS Adopted (S) - SA 2, SA 1 to SA 3, SA 3, as amended, SA 1 to SA 6, SA 6, as amended, SA 7, SA 8, SA 9, and SA 10, adopted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2022
|
SS Offered
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2022
|
Taken Up for Third Reading (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2022
|
Referred: Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Executive Session Scheduled - Monday, May 2, 2022, 1:30 p.m., Senate Committee Room 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Placed on Informal Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
SCS Reported Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2022
|
SCS Voted Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
Public Hearing Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2022
|
Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 6, 2022, 12:00 p.m., Senate Committee Room 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2022
|
Second read and referred: Local Government and Elections(S)
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Reported to the Senate and First Read (S)
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 96 NOES: 35 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Taken Up for Third Reading (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Perfected (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Title of Bill - Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Taken Up for Perfection (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2022
|
Action Postponed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2022
|
Executive Session Continued
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
Public Hearing Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2022
|
Referred: Elections and Elected Officials(H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/06/2022
|
Read Second Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/05/2022
|
Read First Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
12/08/2021
|
Prefiled (H)
|
|
|